HI SB168 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB168
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires commercial helicopter owners and operators to submit reports to the Department of Transportation about basic helicopter flight information. Requires the Department of Transportation to post reports regarding helicopters to its website.
Title
Relating To Helicopters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS/JDC, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB864 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB168 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Re-Referred to TRS/JDC, WAM.
SB168 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Re-Referred to TRS/JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=168&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB168_.HTM |