HI HB864 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB864

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires commercial helicopter owners and operators to submit reports to the Department of Transportation about basic helicopter flight information. Requires the Department of Transportation to post reports regarding helicopters to its website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Helicopters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB168 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB864 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback