HI SB162 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Act 100, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Act 100, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds community health centers, rural health clinics, and mobile dental outreach programs to the list of eligible organizations at which persons with community service licenses may practice. Allows dental hygiene and dental college graduates who have graduated from educational programs that have a reciprocal agreement with the American Dental Association Commission on Dental Accreditation to apply for temporary or community service licenses. Expands eligibility for a community service license to practice dentistry to those candidates who have passed the Integrated National Board Dental Examination within five years of the date of request. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Dentistry Licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | Act 100, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201). |
2023-06-22 | House | Act 100, on 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201). |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 26) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 26). |
2023-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, Sayama, Takenouchi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-23 2:35PM; Conference Room 329. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 829). |
2023-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Sayama, Takenouchi, Pierick. |
2023-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 911). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Aquino. |
2023-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 670). |
2023-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-05 | House | Deferred one day 04-06-23. |
2023-04-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-05-23. |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1881) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-28 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Onishi. |
2023-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-03-17 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Garcia. |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-17-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 97) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 753) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 391) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Community Health Centers
Community Service License
Dental Hygiene
Dentistry
Licensure Requirements
Mobile Dental Outreach Programs
Rural Health Clinics
Temporary License
Community Service License
Dental Hygiene
Dentistry
Licensure Requirements
Mobile Dental Outreach Programs
Rural Health Clinics
Temporary License