HI SB162 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 13
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 13
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the amount of damages recoverable by a tenant subjected to an unlawful retaliatory eviction is equal to two months' rent. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Landlord-tenant Code.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 13 |
2021-02-16 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 12) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-12-21. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 107) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB162 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 13