HI SB162 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the acquisition of raw milk and raw milk products by consumers if certain conditions are met, including a label indicating that raw milk and raw milk products are not pasteurized and are only intended for consumption by pet animals. Requires farms and dairies that produce raw milk or raw milk products to register with the department of health. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 90) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-03-17 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB162 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.