HI SB1607 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the incumbent local exchange carrier from the provisions of chapter 269, HRS, relating to rates, fares, and charges and requires rate filings with the PUC for information purposes only.
Title
Telecommunication Regulations; Local Exchange Carrier; Deregulation
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-13-09 1:00 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-09 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to EDT, CPN. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1607&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB1607_.HTM |