HI SB158 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 146, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 146, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the six-year program and financial plan and budget to include information on pension and other post-employment benefit liabilities. (CD1)
Title
Budget Documents; Pension and OPEB Liabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Act 146, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Act 146, 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 91) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 91). |
2015-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 11:15AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Tupola. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 487). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1568), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1028) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 74) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 885) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 7) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |