HI SB1549 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits commercial permits in Ala Wai and Keehi small boat harbors. Authorizes a process for a public-private partnership to develop a portion of Ala Wai Boat Harbor. Specifies process for establishing moorage fees. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB1549 HD1)
Title
Small Boat Harbors; Commercial Vessels; Development
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Har Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Riviere. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; Kouchi, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 567). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Marumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1570) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Har excused (2). | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1036), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Chong. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 03-18-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 370) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 705) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Shimabukuro. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |