HI SB153 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes penalties for violations of the ignition interlock device law. Requires proof of compliance with the ignition interlock device law to be eligible to apply for a driver's license. Requires the Department of Transportation to provide ignition interlock device installation and services to qualifying individuals at no cost. Doubles the revocation period for those who do not own a vehicle in which to place an ignition interlock device. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Statewide Traffic Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 832) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-12SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 176) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 224.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to TRS, JDC.
2021-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback