HI SB1520 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - (H) Act 195, on 7/6/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a five-member Native Hawaiian roll commission in the office of Hawaiian affairs for administrative purposes to prepare and maintain a roll of qualified Native Hawaiians; requires the commission to publish the roll to facilitate commencement of a convention for the purpose of organization; requires the governor to dissolve the commission after publication of the roll; requires the office of Hawaiian affairs to fund expenses of the Native Hawaiian roll commission; requires a report to the governor and legislature prior to the regular session of 2012. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native Hawaiians; Recognition; Native Hawaiian Roll Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-07 (H) Act 195, on 7/6/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
2011-07-07 (S) Act 195, 7/6/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
2011-05-06 (S) Enrolled to Governor.
2011-05-05 (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702).
2011-05-04 (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694).
2011-05-03 (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
2011-05-03 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2).
2011-04-29 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11.
2011-04-29 (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 41) as amended in (CD 1).
2011-04-29 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11.
2011-04-29 (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 41).
2011-04-29 (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, B. Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Jordan, Ward.
2011-04-29 (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee, Kahele, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige.
2011-04-28 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 312.
2011-04-27 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 4:15PM in conference room 312.
2011-04-26 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 9:00AM in conference room 312.
2011-04-25 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 9:00AM in conference room 312.
2011-04-21 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 312.
2011-04-20 (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 10:30AM in conference room 312.
2011-04-19 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 649).
2011-04-19 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Galuteria, Chair; Hee, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Solomon.
2011-04-19 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652).
2011-04-18 (H) House conferees appointed: Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Chong, Jordan, B. Oshiro, Ward.
2011-04-14 (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605).
2011-04-14 (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments.
2011-04-14 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 564).
2011-04-12 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2011-04-08 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11.
2011-04-08 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1598) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2011-04-05 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman.
2011-04-01 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-11 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
2011-03-24 (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused.
2011-03-24 (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1158) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2011-03-22 (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Carroll, Souki.
2011-03-18 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2011-03-18 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Wooley excused (6).
2011-03-18 (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 998) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2011-03-16 (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Mizuno, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Morikawa, Pine, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2011-03-11 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-16-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2011-03-10 (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
2011-03-10 (H) Pass First Reading
2011-03-08 (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 364) in amended form (SD 2).
2011-03-08 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Espero, Green, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2011-03-04 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11.
2011-03-04 (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 793) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2011-02-28 (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
2011-02-25 (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-11 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2011-02-22 (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2011-02-18 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2011-02-18 (S) Reported from HWN/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 429) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2011-02-16 (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, English, Hee, Kahele, Kidani, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2011-02-14 (S) The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-16-11 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2011-02-14 (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
2011-02-08 (S) The committee(s) on HWN/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-11 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2011-01-28 (S) Referred to HWN/JDL, WAM.
2011-01-28 (S) Passed First Reading.
2011-01-26 (S) Introduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback