HI SB1495 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1495
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Re-referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 29
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Re-referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 29
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to intervene upon official action of the board of trustees in any action to quiet title in which any portion of the land claimed by the plaintiff is kuleana land. Takes effect 3/15/2094. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Actions For Quiet Title.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Re-referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 501) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1013) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 197) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1495 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Re-referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 29