HI SB1475 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds to excluded service under the Hawaii employment security law, service performed by any individual who serves in the capacity of an athletic contest official at a publicly-exhibited contest, including any person who acts as an umpire, referee, judge, linesperson, timer, score keeper, or other similar capacity who receives remuneration solely by way of a game fee.
Title
Employment; Exclusions; Athletic Contest Official
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-11 3:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1475 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB1475_.HTM |