HI SB1461 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1461
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the exemption from the requirement that plans and specifications for construction projects be prepared and construction observed by a licensed engineer, architect, or landscape architect to be determined by floor area of work rather than estimated cost. Exempts one- or two-storied structures that are used primarily as a residence from such requirements. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Building Industry Professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HOU, CPN. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1461 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HOU, CPN.
HB924 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB924 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.