HI SB1423 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1423
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-03 - Re-Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-03 - Re-Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of the public advocate. Establishes rights for members of the public with respect to the conduct and operation of the legislature and its members. Specifies procedures for the investigation and reporting of alleged violations of the rights.
Title
Relating To The Legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1423 (Carry Over) 2023-02-03 - Re-Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
HB725 (Same As) 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB725 (Same As) 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1423&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1423_.HTM |