HI SB1417 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 221, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 221, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Community Development Authority to consider the impacts of climate change, sea level rise, and climate-resilient development in the design and siting of buildings in the Kakaako and Kalaeloa community development districts. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Senate | Act 221, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2023-07-05 | House | Act 221, on 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | House | Floor amendment failed with Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Ichiyama). Excused, 8 (Representative(s) Aiu, Gates, Lowen, Martinez, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita). |
2023-05-04 | House | Floor Amendment No. 14 offered by Rep. Ward. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 186) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 186). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tarnas, Poepoe, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye, Aquino, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 2:35PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 11:05AM; Conference Room 325. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 9:15AM; Conference Room 325. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-23 11:20AM; Conference Room 325. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Tarnas, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Souza. |
2023-04-21 | House | Re-referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Inouye, Aquino Co-Chairs; DeCoite. |
2023-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 570). |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1876), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan. |
2023-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2). |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1476) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:15AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 443) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1054) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 301) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1159 (Same As) 2023-03-10 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
Subjects
Climate Change
Climate-resilient Development
Guidance
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Kakaako
Kalaeloa
Sea Level Rise
Climate-resilient Development
Guidance
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Kakaako
Kalaeloa
Sea Level Rise