HI SB1409 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits newly appointed or reappointed council, board, and commission members from serving if the member has not completed, within the requisite time, the required training course related to native Hawaiian rights. Requires the Office of Hawaiian Affairs and Department of Land and Natural Resources to compile an annual report of members who have failed to complete their training course requirement. Requires the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to record the training courses and make the recordings available to those who were unable to attend the training course. Effective 4/1/2022. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Training In Native Hawaiian Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2021-04-28SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
2021-04-28HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
2021-04-27HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
2021-04-27SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-22HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21.
2021-04-22HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 50) as amended in (CD 1).
2021-04-22Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
2021-04-22SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 50).
2021-04-21SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Rhoads, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-21HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Cullen, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-20SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 1:30PM; CR 325.
2021-04-19SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 1:30PM; CR 325.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2021-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 1:30PM; CR 325.
2021-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Cullen Co-Chairs; Takumi, Ward.
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Acasio, Fevella.
2021-04-13HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2021-04-13SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-09SenateDeferred One Day 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 441).
2021-04-08HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1708), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1477) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 424) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 937) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 431) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:02PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05SenateRe-Referred to HWN, JDC.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to HWN/GVO, JDC.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB800 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback