HI SB1403 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1403
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Director of Transportation to upgrade the motor carrier vehicle inspections in the State by authorizing changes to the program to be implemented by administrative rules.
Title
Relating To Motor Carrier Vehicle Inspections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to TCA, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1105 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1403 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
SB1403 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1403&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1403_.HTM |