HI SB1388 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 288, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1394).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 288, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1394).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the composition of the Research Corporation of the University of Hawaii's Board of Directors. Modifies the procurement exemption for certain construction contracts. Removes the University President as the President of the Research Corporation. Caps the Executive Director's salary. (CD1)
Title
Research Corporation of the University of Hawaii; Board of Directors; Procurement
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 288, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1394). |
2013-07-09 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 288, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1394). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 95) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 95). |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Luke, Nakashima, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Dela Cruz, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Slom. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 2:45PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 329. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-13 10:10AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-25 | House | House conferees appointed: Choy, Luke Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Fale. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 698). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Dela Cruz, Hee, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 637). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1590) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2). |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1087) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hanohano, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Takumi, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-13 2:00 PM. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 390) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 706) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HRE/EGH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 407) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH deferred the measure until 02-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Tokuda. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-13-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/EGH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HRE/EGH/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |