HI SB1386 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1386
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the chairperson of the public utilities commission to appoint an administrative assistant, a research assistant, and legal counsel to assist each member of the public utilities commission with commission duties. Prohibits the chairperson from dismissing or re-assigning appointed staff members without the prior written approval of the affected commissioner.
Title
Relating To The Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1300 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1386 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
SB1386 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1386&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1386_.HTM |