HI SB1385 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1385
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the coverage of employees and employers covered under the minimum wage, overtime, and recordkeeping requirements of chapter 387, Hawaii Revised Statutes, by deleting from the definition of "employee" employees guaranteed a monthly compensation of $2,000 or more. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Wage And Hour Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 430) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 959) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1385 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 17
HB1087 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
HB1087 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.