HI SB1378 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1378

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides appropriations for collective bargaining cost items for the members of bargaining unit (13) and their excluded counterparts, including the cost of salary adjustments and Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund costs negotiated between the State and the bargaining unit representative for fiscal biennium 2021-2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Employment Cost Items.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1126 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1378 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to LCA, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback