HI SB1371 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to adopt rules to accommodate mooring of native Hawaiian canoes owned by entities operated exclusively for educational purposes in small boat harbors. (SB1371 HD1)
Title
Small Boat Harbors; Native Hawaiian Canoes
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 03-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 386) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Slom. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL/THA, WAM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1412 (Same As) 2013-07-02 - Act 243, on 6/28/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346).