HI SB1360 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that inmate services shall not directly or indirectly result in layoffs, reduction in force, job elimination, displacement, replacement, furloughs, contracting out of, or result in the failure to fund exempt civil service positions under section 76-16, HRS, any other provision of law, or bargaining unit positions covered by chapter 89, HRS.
Title
Hawaii Correctional Industries; Inmate Services; Exempt Civil Service
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 9:10AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1428 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to PBS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1360&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB1360_.HTM |