HI SB1360 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Community Care Foster Family Homes to have a primary caregiver as a certified nurse aide and a substitute caregiver as a nurse aide with a certain minimum number of continuing education hours for Community Care Foster Family Homes certified for a maximum of three clients; be certified and in operation for a year prior to being certified for a third client; and make various certifications and licenses available for inspection. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB1360 HD2)
Title
Community Care Foster Family Homes
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 10:50AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 10:50AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, M. Lee Co-Chairs; Hashem, Pine. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ihara, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Ichiyama, Jordan, Morikawa, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Luke, Takai voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1535) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1180) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, C. Lee, Wooley, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Hanohano; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Pine. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-17-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 326) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 479) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Ihara. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-11-11 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to HMS. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |