HI SB136 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a voter with special needs to request that a ballot be forwarded by electronic transmission at any time.
Title
Relating To The Electronic Transmission Of Ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB136 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC.
HB168 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 137, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1239).
HB168 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 137, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1239).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=136&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB136_.HTM |