HI SB1359 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1359
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an offense for placing written materials on state or county property without prior approval. Petty misdemeanor.
Title
Relating To State Property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-16-21 9:15AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1359 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1359&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1359_.HTM |