HI SB1356 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1356
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to article V, section 2, of the Hawaii State Constitution to require that each gubernatorial nominee appoint a person from the same political party as a running mate for lieutenant governor in the general election.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article V, Section 2, Of The Hawaii State Constitution To Require The Gubernatorial Nominee Of Each Political Party To Select The Party's Lieutenant Governor Nominee.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB413 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1356 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JDC.
SB1356 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1356&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1356_.HTM |