HI SB1344 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires noncandidate committees making only independent expenditures if a contribution is more than $10,000 in the aggregate in an election period to report whether its contributing entities are subject to disclosure reporting requirements, provide access to the contributing entities' reportable funding information, or acknowledge that the contributing entities are not subject to any disclosure reporting requirements regarding the source of the contributing entities' funds. (SB1344 HD1)
Title
Campaign Spending; Noncandidate Committees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, Woodson. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 360) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 678) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1491 (Same As) 2015-07-06 - Act 209, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).