HI SB133 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes forfeiture of certain ERS benefits, pursuant to court order, for state or county employees and designated beneficiaries who are convicted of an employment-related felony. (SB133 HD2)
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Retirement Benefits; Felony Convictions; Forfeiture
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1182) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, Woodson. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8). |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 922) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Tupola. |
2015-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-17-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 67) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 714) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB680 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2