HI SB1329 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 224, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires procurement protests to be addressed as expeditiously as possible. Establishes time limits to resolve certain procurement protests. Amends the cash or protest bond amount for parties initiating administrative proceedings for review of certain protest decisions. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07SenateAct 224, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
2021-07-07HouseAct 224, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
2021-04-29SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2021-04-28SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
2021-04-28HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
2021-04-27HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
2021-04-27SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
2021-04-23HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21.
2021-04-23HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 136) as amended in (CD 1).
2021-04-23Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
2021-04-23SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 136).
2021-04-21HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson.
2021-04-21SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 10:10AM; CR 016.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Johanson, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Ward.
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Kim, Kanuha Co-Chairs.
2021-04-15SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-15SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 550).
2021-04-13HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-09HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
2021-04-09HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1843) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-04-07HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-04-06HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-21 2:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-04-01HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-03-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-24HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-03-17HouseThe committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 410) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-03-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 554) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-08SenateRe-Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-09-21 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to GVO, JDC.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback