HI SB132 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB132
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for implementation of a stroke awareness communications plan. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Stroke Awareness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 26) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB132 (Carry Over) 2017-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.