HI SB1317 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1317
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires agencies that collect receipts for any disposition of the public land trust shall each fiscal quarter transfer to the department of Hawaiian home lands or the Office of Hawaiian Affairs twenty per cent of each receipt from the disposition. Provides to the department of Hawaiian home lands certain moneys previously claimed as public land trust overpayments to the office of Hawaiian affairs. Establishes a public land trust revenues negotiating committee exempted from part I of chapter 92, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Land Trust Funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 10:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 192) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1266 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1317 (Carry Over) 2021-03-03 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
SB1317 (Carry Over) 2021-03-03 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Public Land Trust
Public Land Trust Revenues Negotiating Committee
Transfer of Moneys
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Public Land Trust
Public Land Trust Revenues Negotiating Committee
Transfer of Moneys