HI SB1312 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1312
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the Hula Mae multifamily revenue bond authorization to an unspecified amount. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Housing Loan And Mortgage Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EET/HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1312 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.