HI SB131 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the class B felony offense of prohibited acts related to female genital mutilation. Requires prosecuting attorneys of the respective counties to keep annual statistics on cases involving prohibited acts related to female genital mutilation. Requires the Administrator of the Hawaii Criminal Justice Data Center to annually compile and report these county statistics to the Legislature. Establishes mandatory reporting requirements for ongoing or suspected cases of prohibited acts related to female genital mutilation. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Female Genital Mutilation.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Tim Richards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HHS, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB131 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM/HHS, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Annual Report
Appropriation ($)
County Prosecutors
Department of Health
Hawaii Criminal Justice Data Center
Penal Code
Prohibited Acts Related to Female Genital Mutilation
Appropriation ($)
County Prosecutors
Department of Health
Hawaii Criminal Justice Data Center
Penal Code
Prohibited Acts Related to Female Genital Mutilation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=131&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB131_.HTM |