HI SB1309 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires helmet use for individuals under the age of eighteen operating or riding motorcycles, motor scooters, mopeds, and all-terrain vehicles. Requires persons engaging in the business of renting these vehicles to furnish a safety helmet to renters under the age of eighteen of motorcycles, motor scooters, mopeds, and all-terrain vehicles who will drive or ride on these vehicles. (SD1)
Title
Traumatic Brain Injuries; Helmets; All-terrain Vehicles; Motorcycles; Mopeds; Motor Scooters
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 192) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 1:17PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TIA, JDL. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |