HI SB1307 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the Department of Education to determine the feasibility of combining the resources and organization of the Department of Accounting and General Services with the Department of Education on the islands of Kauai, Maui, Molokai, Lanai, and Hawaii island. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making An Appropriation For The Department Of Education To Study The Feasibility Of Combining The Resources And Organization Of The Department Of Accounting And General Services With The Department Of Education On The Islands Of Kauai, Maui, Molokai, Lanai, And Hawaii Island.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 443) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EDU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 425) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to EDU/GVO, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback