HI SB1295 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1295
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendments to the Constitution of the State of Hawaii to expressly provide that the legislature may authorize, by general law, political subdivisions, such as counties, to issue tax increment bonds and to exclude tax increment bonds in calculating the debt limit of the political subdivisions. (HD1)
Title
Proposing Amendments To Article Vii, Sections 12 And 13, Of The Hawaii Constitution To Expressly Provide That The Legislature May Authorize The Counties To Issue Tax Increment Bonds And To Exclude Tax Increment Bonds From Determinations Of The Funded Debt Of The Counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Lowen excused (3). |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1335) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-14 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-14-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 407) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 665) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Lee, Moriwaki. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB997 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1295 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Lowen excused (3).
SB1295 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Lowen excused (3).