HI SB1295 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Enterprise Zone incentives for qualified renewable energy technology business activity on real property owned by the Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority. (SB1295 HD2)
Title
Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority; Enterprise Zone Incentives; Renewable Energy Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 423. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 1:15PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-29-15 1:35PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ohno, Ward. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Wakai, Gabbard, Baker, Kouchi Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 604). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1559), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1123) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Yamane. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-24-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with Representative(s) Ing voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-17-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EDB, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 349) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Ruderman . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 627) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Nishihara. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Inouye, Ruderman. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from GVO/EDT/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Slom, Baker, Espero. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/EDT/ENE, CPN/WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/EDT/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EDT/ENE, CPN. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |