HI SB1289 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1289
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the cap for awards to assist businesses applying for the Small Business Innovation Research Grant Program and the Small Business Technology Transfer Grant Program. Adds purchasing of renewable energy systems as an eligible expense and clarifies that training on both new and existing manufacturing equipment is an eligible expense for the Manufacturing Development Grant Program.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB991 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
SB1289 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to EET, WAM.
SB1289 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Manufacturing Development Grant Program
Small Business Innovation Research Grant Program
Small Business Technology Transfer Grant Program
Manufacturing Development Grant Program
Small Business Innovation Research Grant Program
Small Business Technology Transfer Grant Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1289&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1289_.HTM |