HI SB1267 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from the emergency and budget reserve fund to maintain levels of programs for education, human services, and health. Effective upon approval.
Title
Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-11-11 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Re-Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to HMS/HTH/EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1040 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1267 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB1267_.htm |