HI SB1263 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1263
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires commercial ocean operators who take customers into state waters to engage in recreational activities to have at least one individual aboard the vessel who is rescue diver or lifeguard certified by a nationally recognized certification organization. Requires vessels that transport customers for the purpose of engaging in an activity in state waters to have a backboard, emergency oxygen, and an automated external defibrillator included in its onboard safety equipment. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Commercial Ocean Recreation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 9:50AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to WTL/TCA, CPN. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1263 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
HB184 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB184 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.