HI SB1260 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - (S) Act 033, 4/29/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - (S) Act 033, 4/29/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets forth the State's allocation of any annual or other limit on the principal amount of bonds that may be issued by issuers within Hawaii, including tax exempt interest, tax credits, interest subsidies or other benefits under the Internal Revenue Code, which is limited by federal law. (SD1)
Title
Public Finance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | (S) Act 033, 4/29/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Act 033, on 4/29/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 571). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1442), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Har, C. Lee. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-23-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 21 | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 18) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (English). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 02-14-11. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 113) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-09-11 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1033 (Same As) 2011-02-15 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.