HI SB126 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB126

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Act 009, on 07/31/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Supplemental Appropriations Act of 2020, Supplemental Improvements Act of 2020, Judiciary Supplemental Appropriations Act of 2020, and other measures affecting the fiscal biennium beginning 7/1/2019, and ending 6/30/2021. Appropriates funds designated for the State by the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (CARES Act) to: provide assistance to renters and homeowners; purchase and distribute personal protective equipment to hospitals, childcare facilities, elderly care facilities, businesses, non-profits, and schools; improve airport screening and health assurance security initiatives; support retraining and workforce development programs; provide grants to support the development of a supply chain for cleaning supplies and personal protective equipment; provide food assistance to families in need; support the commercial fishing industry; support public high school seniors who were adversely affected by school closures; and provide additional weekly unemployment benefits to eligible recipients; and other eligible programs as determined by the Governor. Transfers funds from the emergency and budget reserve fund into the general fund. Provides the Governor the option of using funds available in the Hawaii hurricane relief fund. (SB126 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The State Budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31HouseAct 009, on 07/31/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
2020-07-31SenateAct 009, 07/31/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
2020-07-31SenateVetoed on 07-30-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112) - Statement of Objections for the line item appropiration veto.
2020-07-31HouseVetoed on 07-30-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112) - Statement of Objections for the line-item appropriation veto.
2020-07-31SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 07-30-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111)
2020-07-31HouseNotice of intent to veto dated 07-30-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
2020-06-26SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-06-26SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 368).
2020-06-26HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 542).
2020-06-26HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Say, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Wildberger excused (2).
2020-06-26SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-24HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 06-26-20.
2020-06-24HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 1-20) as amended in (CD 1).
2020-06-24Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 06-26-20.
2020-06-24SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 1-20).
2020-06-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 06-23-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2020-06-22SenateReceived notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
2020-06-22SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 364).
2020-06-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 537).
2020-06-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, McDermott.
2020-06-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2020-06-22HouseReceived notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
2020-06-19SenateSenate Conferee(s) discharged.
2020-06-19HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 807).
2019-04-12HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, McDermott.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 725).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3).
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2136) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-04-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseRe-referred to FIN, referral sheet 42
2019-03-21HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-21-19 11:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-19 11:30AM.
2019-03-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:55AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseRe-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-07HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 50) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 896) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB964 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB126 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback