HI SB1256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1256
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends fines for destroying or harvesting trees or tree products, including koa, on state forest reserves lands to an amount up to $10,000 or three times the market value at the time and place of the violation for each tree, whichever is greater, in addition to any costs associated with restoration or replacement of the habitat and damages to public land or natural resources, or any combination thereof. Clarifies that any person violating any provision of part II (Forest Reserves) of chapter 183, Hawaii Revised Statutes, or any rule adopted pursuant thereto, other than section 183-17, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be guilty of a petty misdemeanor. Decriminalizes traffic infractions within forest reserves and sets fine amounts. Repeals the general penalty provision of section 183-4, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Certain Penalties For Violations Of Subtitle 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 500) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL/TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1256 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
HB1030 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1030 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6