HI SB1253 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits eligible non-violent female offenders to be paroled into structured community placement programs monitored by private organizations.
Title
Parole; Structured Community Placement; Non-violent Female Offenders
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1055 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1253&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB1253_.HTM |