HI SB1247 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii State Energy Office to enter into a publicprivate partnership to develop a waste-to-energy generating facility. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Waste-to-energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 396) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 538) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, McKelvey ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1247 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 17
HB1292 (Same As) 2023-02-16 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1292 (Same As) 2023-02-16 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.