HI SB1243 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to authorize state and county traffic projects to make changes, as necessary, to traffic flow and mitigation efforts. Prohibits contractors from charging additional fees to amend traffic flow and safety or mitigation efforts. Requires the Department of Transportation to make a final determination on all changes to traffic flow and mitigation.
Title
Relating To Traffic Control.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1243 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
HB1276 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1276 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1243&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1243_.HTM |