HI SB1232 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1232

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning July 1, 2021, establishes a $0.10 per drink surcharge in addition to the liquor tax. Repeals June 30, 2024. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Liquor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2021-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-10SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 110) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to CPN, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB771 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1232 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback