HI SB1213 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an employer to seek a temporary restraining order and injunction against further harassment of an employee or invitee who may be harassed at the employer's premises or worksite. Effective January 7, 2059. (SB1213 HD1)
Title
Public Safety; Workplace Violence; Restraining Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1156) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 336) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 668) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-26-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee on JDL has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-17-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-17-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1269 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.