HI SB120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB120
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a statutory right of victims and witnesses of sexual offenses under part V of chapter 707, HRS, to a speedy trial in criminal cases involving adult defendants. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Speedy Trial.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB120 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.